Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/9/2020 1:44:08 AM
Friday, February 14, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Created: 2/5/2020 9:07 AM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Beidle, et al

Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment and Execution
Sen Griffith, et al

Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking - Minority Business Enterprises
Sens Hough and Young

Frederick County - Solar Energy - Municipal Electric Utilities

Created: 1/29/2020 3:11 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
12:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin immediately following the floor session.
Charles County Senators

Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sen McCray

Courts - Improperly Summoning a Police Officer - Civil Liability
Sens West and Waldstreicher

Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sen Lam

Homeowners Associations - Adopted Annual Budget - Submission to Lot Owners
Harford County Senators

Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
(Added - 1/31/2020 2:26 PM)
Sen McCray, et al

2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights

Created: 2/14/2020 10:49 AM
Rules Committee - Bill Hearing
12:00 PM - State House Caucus Room, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD 21401
The Pres (DLS)

Annual Curative Bill
The Pres (DLS)

Annual Corrective Bill

House
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Appropriations Committee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
OLA Special Review-Opioid Operational Command Center Audit
(Added - 2/12/2020 1:10 PM)

Created: 1/24/2020 10:06 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Chr W&M (Dept)

Income Tax Credit - Employment of Apprentices - Extension
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2020
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Del Cain, et al

Education - Certification in Secondary Education Content Areas - Expanded Grade Range
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Valentino-Smith, et al

Primary and Secondary Schools - Dependent Children of Service Members - Enrollment and Documentation Requirements
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Dels Walker and Anderton

Education - Public High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Cain, et al

Public Schools - Staff Members - Report
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Patterson, et al

Education - Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program - Workgroup Extension
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Stein

Career and Technology Education - Training in Soft Business Skills
(Added - 1/31/2020 10:16 AM)
Del Cox, et al

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel (First Responders Tax Benefit Act)
(Added - 1/28/2020 11:27 AM)
Dels Lisanti and P. Young

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Military Retirement Income (Defense Workforce Opportunity Act)
(Removed - 2/5/2020 4:32 PM)

Other
Baltimore City
Created: 2/12/2020 9:20 AM
Bill Hearing
8:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Del Bridges, et al

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Dels Branch and Smith

Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Del Clippinger, et al

Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Distance Restrictions, Extension Fee, and Class D License
Del Smith, et al

Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Exchange of Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Del McComas, et al

Public Safety – Pilot Program – Handgun Permit – Church Property
Del Wells, et al

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 Licenses - Surveillance System

Created: 2/12/2020 9:22 AM
Voting Session
9:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Del R. Lewis, et al

Baltimore City - Complete Streets Program Funding - Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
Del Wells, et al

Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
Del Mosby, et al

Baltimore City - Elections - Early Voting Centers

Baltimore County
Created: 2/12/2020 8:43 AM
Briefing
9:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 180
Boy Scouts of America
Baltimore County Office of Tourism
BW Tech
Maryland Tech Council

Created: 2/12/2020 8:47 AM
Bill Hearing
9:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 180
Del Metzgar, et al

Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase
Del P. Young, et al

Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting
Del P. Young, et al

Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Scholarship
Del P. Young, et al

Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Selection

Created: 2/12/2020 8:52 AM
Voting Session
10:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 180
Dels Szeliga and Arikan

Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
Del Long

Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Lead Registry and Code Compliance - Pilot Program
Del Grammer

Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Coffee
Del Long

Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit Supplement
Del Grammer

Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Del P. Young, et al

Baltimore County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales