Day(s)
As of: 4/24/2024 10:10:31 PM
Created: 2/7/2020 1:50 PM
1:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
12:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin at 12:00 pm or immediately following the Senate floor session.
Sens Waldstreicher and Zucker
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of School Psychology Services
(Added - 2/7/2020 4:10 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 2/7/2020 4:10 PM)
Sen Guzzone, et al
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Rosapepe
Public Health - Non-Controlled Dangerous Substance Prescription Record System Program
(Added - 2/21/2020 12:55 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 2/7/2020 4:10 PM)
Sen Benson
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of Residential Service Agency Services
(Removed - 3/4/2020 3:24 PM)
Created: 3/5/2020 11:49 AM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
or immediately following session
Created: 3/5/2020 11:52 AM
2:15 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Supplemental Budget
Created: 2/10/2020 3:27 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Chr ECM (Dept)
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Chr ECM (Dept)
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Dels Wilson and Atterbeary
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Del Mosby
Financial Institutions - State Banks - Investing in For-Profit Correctional Facilities - Prohibited
(Removed - 3/3/2020 4:36 PM)
Created: 2/10/2020 10:19 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 382 (Croom Road) PG 307-20
(Added - 2/18/2020 9:51 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Church Road PG 302-20
(Added - 2/18/2020 9:51 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Intersection of Suitland Road and Skyline Drive PG 310-20
(Added - 2/18/2020 9:51 AM)
(Added - 2/14/2020 3:08 PM)
(Added - 3/2/2020 11:59 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Residential Districts and School Zones PG 313-20
(Added - 2/18/2020 9:51 AM)
Del Solomon, et al
School Buildings - Drinking Water Outlets - Elevated Level of Lead (Safe School Drinking Water Act)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Ways and Means)
Del Chang
Criminal Law – Humane Society and Animal Control Officers – Education and Training Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Judiciary)
(Removed - 2/11/2020 11:21 AM)
(Removed - 3/3/2020 4:31 PM)
(Removed - 3/4/2020 11:00 AM)
Created: 2/10/2020 4:31 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 2/28/2020 8:52 AM)
(Added - 2/10/2020 5:55 PM)
(Added - 2/10/2020 5:55 PM)
(Added - 2/10/2020 5:55 PM)
(Added - 2/10/2020 5:55 PM)
Del Johnson, et al
Public Health – Non–Controlled Substance Prescription Record System Program
(Added - 2/10/2020 5:55 PM)
(Added - 2/10/2020 5:55 PM)
(Removed - 2/12/2020 3:35 PM)
Del Charles, et al
State Finance and Procurement - Procurement Improvement Council - Required Use of eMaryland Marketplace
(Removed - 2/12/2020 3:35 PM)
(Removed - 2/27/2020 10:46 AM)
Created: 2/10/2020 1:25 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Conaway
Public Safety - Workgroup to Study the Integration of Unmanned Aircraft Systems Within State and Local Government Fire Safety Operations and Pilot Program
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
Del Wilkins, et al
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Standards at State Correctional Facilities
Del Feldmark, et al
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020)
Del J. Lewis
Independent Oversight and Review Board for Health Care of Inmates in State Correctional Facilities - Establishment
Created: 2/10/2020 4:01 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Montgomery County Delegation
Montgomery County - Authority of County Council Over Inspector General - Montgomery County Public Schools MC 14-20
(Added - 2/13/2020 3:36 PM)
Del Guyton, et al
County Boards of Education - Therapy Dogs - Certification and Use in Schools
(Added - 2/11/2020 11:29 AM)
Del Queen, et al
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Electric Retractable Room Partitions - Model Safety Guidelines and Local Law
(Added - 2/24/2020 4:13 PM)
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
Del Rose, et al
Public Schools – Mathematics Credit – Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
Del Boteler, et al
Baltimore County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2020 10:37 AM)
Special Guest: U.S. Senator Ben Cardin
Special Presentations: Goodwill Industries, BARD High School Early College.
Maryland State Arts Council
The Walters Art Museum
The Hippodrome Theater
Maryland State Fair
Senator Ben Cardin
Senator Chris Van Hollen
Del Grammer
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Del Boteler, et al
Baltimore County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships