Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 7/6/2020 3:12:41 AM
Thursday, May 14, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 5/11/2020 11:15 AM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Department of Human Services regarding SNAP benefits

Other
School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 4/29/2020 7:19 AM
9:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Conference Call
11:15 AM to 12:30 PM - Conference Call
To watch click on livestream, and click on "Youtube Live Stream" under the appropriate date. Additional meeting information will be available at iac.maryland.gov
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business and to approve 100% Capital Improvement Program allocations.

Student Data Privacy Council
Created: 4/23/2020 3:45 PM
9:00 AM - Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD
9:00 AM - Conference Call
Conference Call-in Number: 1-855-797-9480 (U.S. Toll Free)
(Added - 5/12/2020 8:41 AM)
Access Code: 612 767 457
(Added - 5/12/2020 8:41 AM)
Monthly Meeting