Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/27/2020 9:45:23 AM
Thursday, August 27, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Police Reform and Accountability in Maryland, Workgroup to Address
Created: 8/17/2020 11:02 AM
Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Briefing by Law Enforcement Representatives.
(Added - 8/19/2020 1:37 PM)
Briefings by the Association of Chiefs & Sheriffs, the Fraternal Order of Police, and the Maryland State Troopers Association.
(Removed - 8/19/2020 1:37 PM)

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Created: 7/30/2020 4:24 PM
1:30 PM to 2:30 PM - Conference Call
General Meeting of the Oversight Committee
Call-In-Phone #: +1-929-276-1310
PIN: 361 004 416#