Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/28/2020 11:46:31 AM
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 9/8/2020 10:04 AM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Impact of COVID-19 on Racial Disparities in Maryland
(Added - 9/14/2020 9:32 AM)
- COVID–19 and Health Disparities: The Johns Hopkins Medicine Response: Dr. Sherita Hill Golden, MD, MHS, Hugh P. McCormick Family Professor of Endocrinology and Metabolism, Vice President and Chief Diversity Officer, Johns Hopkins Medicine
(Added - 9/14/2020 9:32 AM)
- COVID–19 in Anne Arundel County and Local Outreach Efforts: Dr. Nilesh Kalyanaraman, Health Officer, Anne Arundel County
(Added - 9/14/2020 9:32 AM)
- COVID–19 Racial and Ethnic Data Collection and State Outreach Efforts: Dr. Jinlene Chan, Acting Deputy Secretary of Public Health Services, MDH; Dr. Noel Brathwaite, Director, Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
(Added - 9/14/2020 9:32 AM)
Impact of COVID-19 on Racial Disparities in Maryland
(Removed - 9/14/2020 9:32 AM)

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Created: 7/21/2020 2:43 PM
5:30 PM - On-Line Meeting
To view the livestream, click here
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's criminal sentencing policies.