Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/3/2020 7:11:04 AM
Wednesday, June 3, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 5/29/2020 1:58 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Maryland Department of Commerce

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 12/30/2019 2:29 PM
10:00 AM - Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Floor State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
This meeting is being conducted via webinar. Click here to view
General Meeting

Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Created: 6/2/2020 4:47 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Canceled
9:00 AM - One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
Meeting of Full Authority + Hearings