Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 9/22/2020 1:52:51 PM
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
Senate
Created: 9/4/2020 11:50 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
1:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Material
Click here to sign up for Oral Testimony
Meeting Video
Bill Hearings on Police Accountability and Law Enforcement Reform

House
Created: 9/10/2020 2:02 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Briefing
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
This is a virtual briefing. You can watch a livestream of the briefing HERE.
"The Reopening of the Judiciary" and "Covid-19 Access to Justice Task Force Strategies and Solutions."
Including Presentations by: The Maryland Judiciary and the Maryland Attorney General

Other
Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities, Commission on
Created: 9/3/2020 7:44 AM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
To join the meeting click here
Meeting will involve discussion of Environmental Justice issues.