Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/22/2021 9:19:01 PM
Friday, January 22, 2021
Senate
Created: 1/19/2021 4:50 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
Thursday, January 21, 2021 4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Chiropractic Examiners - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Public Accountancy – Education Requirements – Obsolete References
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension
(Added - 1/19/2021 5:01 PM)
Sen Eckardt

Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Chr EHE (Dept)

Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories
Chr EHE (Dept)

Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Leases
Chr EHE (Dept)

Emergency Medical Services – Paramedics – Vaccination Administration
(Added - 1/20/2021 11:51 AM)

House
Canceled
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The Spkr

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding

Created: 12/22/2020 4:44 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the State Board of Elections

Created: 1/20/2021 12:41 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Some or all of these bills to be voted on.
Del Feldmark

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Del Washington

State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Del Wilson

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Del Wilson

Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Del Smith

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
(Removed - 1/21/2021 1:45 PM)

Revenues Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Created: 1/15/2021 12:25 PM
Revenues Subcommittee - Voting Session
12:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Feldmark

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Del Wilson

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund

Education Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Canceled
Education Subcommittee
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Subcommittee Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/18/2021 12:31 PM
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Washington

State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Del Wilson

Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Del Smith

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
(Removed - 1/21/2021 1:44 PM)

Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 1/9/2021 7:54 AM
Briefing
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Update from County Executive Steuart Pittman on Covid-19 and the County.

Baltimore City
Created: 1/15/2021 10:56 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Education briefing with Baltimore City Schools CEO, Dr. Sonja Santelises
(Added - 1/19/2021 6:19 PM)
Local Bill Hearings

Baltimore County
Created: 1/19/2021 5:41 PM
Briefing
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Baltimore County Multi-Year Improvement Plan for All Schools (MYIPAS)
(Joint Baltimore County House and Senate Delegations)
Bill Hearing (House Delegation only): HB4, HB253,HB348

Eastern Shore
Created: 1/14/2021 10:47 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Frederick
Created: 1/15/2021 3:24 PM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Economic security update for Frederick County.

Montgomery
Created: 1/20/2021 7:54 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 1/9/2021 8:20 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders

Prince George's
Created: 1/12/2021 2:42 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Meeting

Southern Maryland
Created: 1/19/2021 3:48 PM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting