Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/7/2021 11:22:15 PM
Monday, January 4, 2021
Monday, January 4, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 4, 2021 11:23 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 20, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0001
Sen Sydnor, et al

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
ADDED: 11:23 AM

Change made: January 4, 2021 11:23 AM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
January 25, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 4, 2021 10:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Other
January 14, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 4, 2021 5:03 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
January 14, 2021 11:30 AM
(Previous Date/Time: January 14, 2021 11:00 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB0032
Chr JPR (Dept)

Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability
SB0044
Chr JPR (Dept)

Correctional Officers - Age Requirement
SB0109
Chr JPR (Dept)

Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility
SB0118
Chr JPR (Dept)

Correctional Services - Warrant Apprehension Unit - Transfer
SB0132
Chr JPR (Dept)

Inspection of Public Records – Notaries Public – Disclosure of Home Address and Phone Number
SB0181
Chr JPR (Dept)

Corporations and Associations - Trade Name Certificates - Requirements
SB0193
Chr JPR (Dept)

Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Facilities - Transfer of Ownership and Abolishment of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services
REMOVED: 5:03 PM
SB0212
Chr JPR (Dept)

State Government - Notaries Public - Official Stamp of a Notary Public
SB0222
Chr JPR (Dept)

Juveniles Charged as Adults – Study and Confinement
SB0264
Chr JPR (Dept)

Criminal Procedure – Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision – Conditions, Violations, and Petitions for Discharge
SB0267
Chr JPR (Dept)

Family Law – Investigation of Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect – Preliminary Report to State’s Attorney
SB0291
Chr JPR (Dept)

Motor Vehicle Offenses – Following Too Closely – Unified Truck Travel
SB0320
Chr JPR (Dept)

Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
SB0339
The Pres (Dept)

Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 4, 2021 5:30 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Other
January 14, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 4, 2021 5:30 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 19, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0001
The Spkr

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
HB0189
Del Qi

Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program
HB0255
Del Hill, et al

Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs - Funding
HB0307
Del Rosenberg

Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
HB0414
Del D.M. Davis

Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project – Funding

Change made: January 4, 2021 5:49 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 20, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0026
Del Lopez

Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
HB0098
Del Washington

Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program - Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)
HB0244
Del Valentino-Smith

Task Force to Study Access to Mental Health Care in Higher Education
HB0251
Del Carr

Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
HB0258
Del Guyton

State Child Welfare System - Reporting
HB0310
Del Lierman

Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
HB0406
Del P. Young

Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
HB0059
Del Pena-Melnyk

Task Force on Higher Education Students With Chronic Health Conditions
ADDED: 5:49 PM
HB0133
Del Korman

State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
ADDED: 5:49 PM

Change made: January 4, 2021 5:35 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
January 25, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: January 4, 2021 8:00 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Other
January 5, 2021 9:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting/Informational Meeting
REMOVED: 8:00 AM
Organizational/Informational Meeting
ADDED: 8:00 AM

Change made: January 4, 2021 3:44 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 29, 2021 11:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: January 29, 2021 1:30 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0021
Del Love

Environment – Recycling – Prohibition on the Chemical Conversion of Plastic
HB0146
Del Lehman, et al

Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Fee on Commercial Feed
HB0208
Dels Healey and Stein

Agriculture – Neonicotinoid Pesticides – Sale and Storage
HB0281
Del Chang

Criminal Law - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
HB0381
Del Long

Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 4, 2021 12:59 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 20, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0155
Del Wilkins

County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
REMOVED: 12:59 PM

Change made: January 4, 2021 3:59 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
January 27, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Education Briefing by MSDE, PSSAM, MABE, and MSEA

Change made: January 4, 2021 1:13 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0155
Del Wilkins

County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
ADDED: 1:02 PM
HB0401
Del Guyton

Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
ADDED: 1:13 PM

Other
Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on
Change made: January 4, 2021 8:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on - Other
January 7, 2021 10:00 AM to January 7, 2021 11:30 AM
Google Meet Video Conference
Discuss initial recommendations

Click to return on the top page