Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/28/2020 11:46:09 AM
Monday, January 6, 2020
Monday, January 6, 2020
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 6, 2020 1:41 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 15, 2020 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0051
Sen Patterson

Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects
SB0053
Sen Reilly

Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Anne Arundel County - Warrant Intercept Program
SB0055
Sen Young

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund
SB0061
Sens Kagan and Reilly

Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
SB0063
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
SB0066
Sen Ellis

Income Tax - Credit for Small Businesses - State Minimum Wage Increase
SB0108
Sen Ellis

Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters
SB0109
Sen Ellis

Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
SB0121
Sen Eckardt

Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
SB0122
Sen McCray

Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 6, 2020 2:08 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
January 9, 2020 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: January 9, 2020 1:30 PM)
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0006
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Real Estate Commission - Sunset Extension
SB0071
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
SB0116
Chr EHE (Dept)

Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Sunset Extension

House
Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 6, 2020 10:35 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
January 15, 2020 11:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Bureau of Revenue Estimates

Change made: January 6, 2020 10:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
January 15, 2020 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Maryland State Department of Education

Change made: January 6, 2020 10:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
January 22, 2020 11:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Local Aid by the Department of Legislative Services, Maryland Association of Counties, and the Maryland Municipal League

Change made: January 6, 2020 10:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
January 23, 2020 11:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Department of Commerce