Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/27/2021 3:57:24 PM
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee
Change made: January 13, 2021 4:57 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 8, 2021 1:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
Interagency Commission on School Construction
Maryland State Library Agency
Maryland Technology Development Corporation

Change made: January 13, 2021 4:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 8, 2021 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Interagency Commission on School Construction
Maryland State Library Agency
Maryland Technology Development Corporation

Change made: January 13, 2021 5:02 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 22, 2021 1:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
MSDE Funding for Educational Organizations
Aid to Community Colleges

Change made: January 13, 2021 5:02 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 22, 2021 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
MSDE Funding for Educational Organizations
Aid to Community Colleges

Change made: January 13, 2021 5:14 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 1, 2021 1:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
MSDE Aid to Education
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance

Change made: January 13, 2021 5:14 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 1, 2021 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
MSDE Aid to Education
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 13, 2021 2:18 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
January 21, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0050
Sen Carter

Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Intervene
REMOVED: 2:18 PM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 13, 2021 9:51 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 20, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0406
Del P. Young

Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
REMOVED: 9:51 AM

Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Change made: January 13, 2021 4:54 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 8, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Interagency Commission on School Construction
Maryland State Library Agency
Maryland Technology Development Corporation

Change made: January 13, 2021 4:54 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 8, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Interagency Commission on School Construction
Maryland State Library Agency
Maryland Technology Development Corporation

Change made: January 13, 2021 5:02 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 22, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Funding for Educational Organizations
Aid to Community Colleges

Change made: January 13, 2021 5:02 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 22, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Funding for Educational Organizations
Aid to Community Colleges

Change made: January 13, 2021 5:14 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 1, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Aid to Education
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance

Change made: January 13, 2021 5:14 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 1, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Aid to Education
Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission
MHEC - Student Financial Assistance

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: January 13, 2021 3:02 PM - HEARING ADDED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
January 19, 2021 5:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 13, 2021 10:19 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 19, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0412
Del K. Young

Task Force to Study Increased Voter Participation
REMOVED: 10:19 AM

Other
Baltimore City
Change made: January 13, 2021 10:46 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Baltimore City - Other
January 15, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Baltimore County
Change made: January 13, 2021 11:24 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Baltimore County - Other
January 15, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting
REMOVED: 11:24 AM
Organizational Meeting
ADDED: 11:24 AM

Howard
Change made: January 13, 2021 4:10 PM - HEARING ADDED
Howard - Other
January 20, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Alcoholic Beverage Bills
Organizational Overview
Legislative Bond Initiatives

Montgomery
Change made: January 13, 2021 2:30 PM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 15, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County

Change made: January 13, 2021 2:25 PM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 18, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee.

Change made: January 13, 2021 2:16 PM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 21, 2021 9:45 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of Legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.

Click to return on the top page