Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/6/2021 9:23:54 AM
Thursday, January 14, 2021
Thursday, January 14, 2021
Senate
Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 14, 2021 3:32 PM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
January 21, 2021 5:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: January 14, 2021 10:18 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0084
Del Feldmark, et al

Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
HB0117
Del Rogers

Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
HB0148
Del Carey

Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
HB0218
Del Love

Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
HB0340
Del Pena-Melnyk

Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act)

Revenues Subcommittee
Change made: January 14, 2021 9:17 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Revenues Subcommittee - Briefing
January 28, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube

Other
Eastern Shore
Change made: January 14, 2021 10:47 AM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore - Other
January 22, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Change made: January 14, 2021 10:48 AM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore - Other
January 29, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Change made: January 14, 2021 10:49 AM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore - Other
February 5, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Change made: January 14, 2021 10:50 AM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore - Other
February 12, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Change made: January 14, 2021 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore - Other
February 19, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Change made: January 14, 2021 10:52 AM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore - Other
February 26, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Change made: January 14, 2021 10:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore - Other
March 5, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Change made: January 14, 2021 10:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore - Other
March 12, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Change made: January 14, 2021 10:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Eastern Shore - Other
March 19, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
General discussion of events and legislation pertinent to the Eastern Shore Delegation.

Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on
Change made: January 14, 2021 2:44 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on - Other
January 20, 2021 9:30 AM to January 20, 2021 10:30 AM
Google Meet Video Conference
Discuss initial recommendations and priorities during the legislative session.

Click to return on the top page