Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 7/5/2020 3:26:49 PM
Friday, May 8, 2020
Friday, May 8, 2020
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: May 8, 2020 4:23 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
May 12, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Public Hearing on Unemployment Insurance Issues joint with Finance Committee

Finance Committee
Change made: May 8, 2020 4:23 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Briefing
May 12, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Public Hearing on Unemployment Insurance Issues Joint with Budget and Taxation Commitee

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: May 8, 2020 12:51 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
May 21, 2020 2:15 PM
Virtual Meeting

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: May 8, 2020 3:19 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
May 11, 2020 2:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
MDOT Briefing - Transportation Trust Fund