Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 7/5/2020 11:21:41 PM
Monday, May 11, 2020
Monday, May 11, 2020
House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: May 11, 2020 11:15 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
May 21, 2020 2:15 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Department of Budget and Management
ADDED: 11:15 AM

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: May 11, 2020 11:09 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
May 13, 2020 2:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
• Update on expanded eligibility and enhanced benefits under CARES Act to State UI benefits;
• Update on claims volume;
• Summary of programming updates to accommodate high claims volume; and
• Anticipated impact on UITF and employer contributions.

Health and Social Services Subcommittee
Change made: May 11, 2020 11:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
May 14, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Department of Human Services regarding SNAP benefits

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: May 11, 2020 11:15 AM - HEARING ADDED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
May 20, 2020 2:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Maryland Department of Transportation on TTF Revenue Attainment

Other
School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: May 11, 2020 9:03 AM - HEARING UPDATED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
May 14, 2020 11:15 AM to May 14, 2020 12:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: May 14, 2020 9:00 AM to 12:00 PM)
Conference Call
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business and to approve 100% Capital Improvement Program allocations.