Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 7/4/2020 12:33:04 AM
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: May 12, 2020 7:36 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
May 13, 2020 1:00 PM to May 13, 2020 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the State Board of Elections on policy and implementation issues regarding Maryland's elections.

House
Election Law Subcommittee
Change made: May 12, 2020 12:33 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
May 13, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
For more information contact Stacy Goodman at stacy.goodman@mlis.state.md.us
Briefing by the State Board of Elections on policy and implementation issues regarding Maryland's elections.

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: May 12, 2020 12:33 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
May 13, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
For more information contact Stacy Goodman at stacy.goodman@mlis.state.md.us
Briefing by the State Board of Elections on policy and implementation issues regarding Maryland's elections.

Other
Juvenile Services Education System Workgroup
Change made: May 12, 2020 8:42 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Juvenile Services Education System Workgroup - Other
June 8, 2020 1:30 PM to June 8, 2020 3:30 PM
Conference Room 2, 8th Floor, Nancy S. Grasmick Bldg., 200 West Baltimore St., Baltimore, MD
Monthly Meeting

Student Data Privacy Council
Change made: May 12, 2020 8:41 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Student Data Privacy Council - Other
May 14, 2020 9:00 AM
Conference Call
(Previous Location: Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD)
Monthly Meeting
Conference Call-in Number: 1-855-797-9480 (U.S. Toll Free)
ADDED: 8:41 AM
Access Code: 612 767 457
ADDED: 8:41 AM