Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 8/6/2020 1:38:59 PM
Monday, May 18, 2020
Monday, May 18, 2020
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: May 18, 2020 10:01 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Finance Committee - Briefing
May 19, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
(Previous Location: East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD)
Virtual Briefing: Update from Maryland Insurance Administration on COVID-19 Related Matters
Briefing on Banks and COVID-19 Related Impact Payments and Small Business Loans

House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: May 18, 2020 6:26 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
May 27, 2020 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting

Other
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Change made: May 18, 2020 4:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup - Other
May 20, 2020 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting

Change made: May 18, 2020 4:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup - Other
May 27, 2020 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting