Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 7/2/2020 1:08:01 PM
Tuesday, June 2, 2020
Tuesday, June 2, 2020
House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: June 2, 2020 12:45 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
June 9, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Availability and Suitability of PPE for Frontline State Employees - Joint with Senate Finance Committee

Change made: June 2, 2020 1:05 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
June 11, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Education Issues Related to the COVID-19 Pandemic
REMOVED: 1:05 PM
Briefing on Education Issues Related to the COVID-19 Pandemic - Joint with the House Ways and Means Committee
ADDED: 1:05 PM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: June 2, 2020 3:24 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
June 11, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting

Other
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Change made: June 2, 2020 4:47 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup - Other
June 3, 2020 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting

Change made: June 2, 2020 4:48 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup - Other
June 10, 2020 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting