Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/20/2020 10:50:58 PM
Friday, August 28, 2020
Friday, August 28, 2020
Other
Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to
Change made: August 28, 2020 1:32 PM - HEARING ADDED
Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to - Other
September 14, 2020 2:00 PM
Zoom Meeting

Change made: August 28, 2020 1:32 PM - HEARING ADDED
Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to - Other
September 28, 2020 2:00 PM
Zoom Meeting

Spending Affordability Committee
Change made: August 28, 2020 9:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Spending Affordability Committee - Briefing
October 27, 2020 3:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Briefing on the forecast of revenues and expenditures for the current and upcoming fiscal years; Overview of the Transportation Trust Fund, State personnel, debt and the Capital Budget

Change made: August 28, 2020 9:05 AM - HEARING ADDED
Spending Affordability Committee - Other
December 15, 2020 3:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Decision Meeting.