Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/8/2021 11:54:28 AM
Monday, March 8, 2021
Monday, March 8, 2021
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: March 8, 2021 11:46 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
March 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0665
Sen Peters

Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices
REMOVED: 11:46 AM

Change made: March 8, 2021 11:22 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
March 10, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0798
Sen Gallion

Prohibition on Sale of Wildlife - Local Venison Donation Programs - Application
REMOVED: 11:22 AM

House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: March 8, 2021 10:54 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
March 8, 2021 4:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0012
Del C. Watson, et al

Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
REMOVED: 10:54 AM
HB0795
Wicomico County Delegation

Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Food Sales Requirement for Class B (Golf Course) License
REMOVED: 10:54 AM
HB0974
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-20
REMOVED: 10:54 AM
HB0979
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
REMOVED: 10:54 AM
HB0994
Del Qi

Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Delivery - Class A License Holders
REMOVED: 10:54 AM
HB1016
Del M. Fisher

Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees
REMOVED: 10:54 AM

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 8, 2021 9:31 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 10, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HB 881

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: March 8, 2021 9:31 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
March 11, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HB 1022

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: March 8, 2021 8:27 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
March 10, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Time of subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete.
REMOVED: 8:27 AM

Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee
Change made: March 8, 2021 9:32 AM - HEARING ADDED
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Work Session
March 9, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HB 601 and HB 910

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: March 8, 2021 8:26 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
March 11, 2021 12:30 PM to March 11, 2021 1:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 9, 2021 12:30 PM to 1:30 PM)
Zoom / YouTube

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: March 8, 2021 9:31 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 9, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
-HB 463, 611, 643, 849, 1148, 1243, and 1280

Revenues Subcommittee
Change made: March 8, 2021 9:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Revenues Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 11, 2021 12:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0337
Del P. Young

Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit - Job Training
HB0752
Del Ebersole

Income Tax Credit - Food Donation Pilot Program - Extension
HB0805
Del Palakovich Carr

Economic Development - Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations
HB1017
Del Beitzel

Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation – Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
HB1279
Del Luedtke

Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program - Alterations

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: March 8, 2021 9:30 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
March 23, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0529
Sen Elfreth (AA Co Admin)

Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
ADDED: 9:30 AM
SB0593
Sen Zucker, et al

Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Calculation and Refunds
ADDED: 9:30 AM
SB0596
Sen Washington

Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
ADDED: 9:30 AM

Change made: March 8, 2021 11:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
March 25, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0314
Sens McCray and Elfreth

Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
ADDED: 9:58 AM
SB0447
Sen Edwards

Historic Revitalization Tax Credit – Certified Historic Structure and Single–Family, Owner–Occupied Residence – Definitions
ADDED: 9:58 AM
SB0533
Sen Guzzone

Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
ADDED: 9:58 AM
SB0678
Sen Edwards

Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland - Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force
ADDED: 9:58 AM
SB0591
Sens Zucker and Elfreth

Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance
ADDED: 11:09 AM

Other
No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: March 8, 2021 8:34 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 15, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Change made: March 8, 2021 8:36 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 19, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Southern Maryland
Change made: March 8, 2021 10:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Southern Maryland - Other
March 12, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Southern Maryland Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page