Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/4/2021 10:47:05 AM
Thursday, March 4, 2021
Thursday, March 4, 2021
Senate
Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: March 4, 2021 8:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
March 8, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: March 4, 2021 8:34 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
March 8, 2021 5:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0986
Del Harrison

Labor and Employment - Workplace Fraud Act - Rebuttable Presumption of the Employer-Employee Relationship
REMOVED: 10:08 AM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 4, 2021 8:40 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
March 4, 2021 5:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0670
The Spkr (Plc Rfm Accntblty Wrkgrp)

Police Reform and Accountability Act of 2021

Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Work Session
March 8, 2021 3:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Public Utilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Utilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 11, 2021 3:00 PM to March 11, 2021 4:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Change made: March 4, 2021 8:50 AM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On - Other
May 11, 2021 5:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

No. 7 - Prince George's County
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 7 - Prince George's County - Other
March 4, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearing
ADDED: 10:00 AM

Prince George's
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:00 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Prince George's - Other
March 4, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearing

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Change made: March 4, 2021 7:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup - Other
March 8, 2021 4:00 PM to March 8, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page