Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/15/2021 2:59:14 PM
Friday, January 15, 2021
Friday, January 15, 2021
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 15, 2021 2:47 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0090
Sen Feldman

Electric Facilities - Study and Procedures
REMOVED: 2:47 PM

Change made: January 15, 2021 2:47 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0280
Sen Feldman

Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Police Complaints Board
REMOVED: 2:47 PM

House
Revenues Subcommittee
Change made: January 15, 2021 12:25 PM - HEARING ADDED
Revenues Subcommittee - Voting Session
January 22, 2021 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0006
Del Feldmark

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
HB0358
Del Wilson

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund

Other
Baltimore City
Change made: January 15, 2021 10:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Other
January 22, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Local Bill Hearings

Harford
Change made: January 15, 2021 10:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Harford - Other
January 21, 2021 9:00 AM to January 21, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Harford County Delegation Meeting

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: January 15, 2021 10:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
January 25, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders

Change made: January 15, 2021 11:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
January 29, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders