Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/6/2021 1:31:06 PM
Saturday, March 6, 2021
Saturday, March 6, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: March 6, 2021 1:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 9, 2021 8:30 AM to March 9, 2021 10:30 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 6, 2021 1:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 10, 2021 3:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 6, 2021 1:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
March 12, 2021 10:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page