Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 7/7/2020 4:22:43 PM
Tuesday, July 7, 2020
Tuesday, July 7, 2020
Other
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup
Change made: July 7, 2020 1:23 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Covid-19 Response Legislative Workgroup - Other
July 8, 2020 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting

Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to
Change made: July 7, 2020 7:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to - Other
July 22, 2020 2:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public before the hearing begins.

Change made: July 7, 2020 9:59 AM - HEARING ADDED
Restore Trust in Policing, Commission to - Other
August 3, 2020 2:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public before the hearing begins.

Student Data Privacy Council
Change made: July 7, 2020 10:36 AM - HEARING ADDED
Student Data Privacy Council - Other
July 9, 2020 9:00 AM to July 9, 2020 11:00 AM
Conference Call
Monthly Meeting
Access Code: 161 548 0220
To join by phone: 1-855-797-9480 (Toll Free)