Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/26/2020 3:59:24 PM
Monday, October 26, 2020
Monday, October 26, 2020
Other
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Change made: October 26, 2020 8:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families - Other
November 5, 2020 10:00 AM
On-Line Meeting
Briefings on child care access and affordability.

Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology
Change made: October 26, 2020 12:03 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Joint Committee on Cybersecurity, Information Technology and Biotechnology - Other
October 28, 2020 10:30 AM
(Previous Date/Time: October 28, 2020 10:00 AM)
On-Line Meeting
(3) Potential committee legislation for the 2021 legislative session.
(1) The status and progress of State information technology modernization;
(2) Cybersecurity for State government, local governments, and small businesses in the State; and

Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Change made: October 26, 2020 8:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Other
November 4, 2020 1:00 PM
On-Line Meeting
Updates from State agencies.
Adaptive reuse of commercial space.

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Change made: October 26, 2020 10:00 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
October 29, 2020 9:00 AM to October 29, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
REMOVED: 10:00 AM