Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 2/27/2021 8:59:44 PM
Saturday, February 27, 2021
Saturday, February 27, 2021
House
Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2021 9:13 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Work Session
March 1, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Agenda to come.
REMOVED: 9:13 AM
HBs: 88, 128, 231, 234, 270
ADDED: 9:13 AM

Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2021 10:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 1, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Family and Juvenile Law Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2021 9:13 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Family and Juvenile Law Subcommittee - Work Session
March 2, 2021 12:15 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Agenda to come.
REMOVED: 9:13 AM
HBs: 93, 343, 646, 893
ADDED: 9:13 AM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 27, 2021 9:13 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 9, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB1115
Del Wilson

Criminal Law – Felony Murder – Limitations and Review
REMOVED: 9:13 AM

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: February 27, 2021 8:47 PM - HEARING ADDED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Voting Session
March 2, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page