Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/22/2021 11:27:11 AM
Friday, January 22, 2021
Friday, January 22, 2021
House
Early Childhood Subcommittee
Change made: January 22, 2021 10:07 AM - HEARING ADDED
Early Childhood Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0237
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
HB0405
Del Lopez

Special Education - Judicial Actions - Attorney's Fees and Related Costs

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 22, 2021 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
February 2, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
-Briefing on COVID-19 Vaccine Distribution

Change made: January 22, 2021 10:51 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2021 3:45 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 2, 2021 1:30 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0029
Del Ivey

Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Substance Use Disorder
HB0108
Del Charkoudian

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
HB0022
Del Love

Environment - PFAS Chemicals - Prohibitions and Requirements
HB0276
Del Henson

Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation
HB0463
Del Barron

Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
HB0484
Del Cullison

Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: January 22, 2021 9:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Work Session
January 27, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Exact time of subcommittee meeting will be announced after Bill Hearings are complete

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 22, 2021 11:09 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0654
Del Qi

Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
ADDED: 11:09 AM