Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/20/2021 10:50:24 AM
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 10:35 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
January 25, 2021 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
(Previous Location: Zoom / YouTube)
Fiscal Briefing

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 9:21 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
February 16, 2021 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 9:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
January 22, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0001
The Spkr

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 10:47 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2021 2:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 3, 2021 2:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
HB0207
Del Wilson

Nursing Homes - Resident Change in Condition - Notification
HB0303
Del Stewart

Long-Term Care Insurance - Prohibition on Premium Increases (Long Term Stability for Seniors Act
HB0416
Del Belcastro

Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Memory Care and Alzheimer's Disease Unit Regulations

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 20, 2021 10:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0546
Del Hornberger

Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
ADDED: 10:35 AM
HB0553
Del Ebersole

State Lottery Tickets - Prohibition on Internet Sales - Repeal
ADDED: 10:35 AM

Other
Montgomery
Change made: January 20, 2021 7:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 22, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation and other business relevant to Montgomery County.

Change made: January 20, 2021 7:57 AM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 25, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Land Use, Transportation, and Public Safety Committee