Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/15/2021 3:42:21 PM
Friday, January 15, 2021
Friday, January 15, 2021
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 15, 2021 3:11 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
January 19, 2021 4:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0086
Chr FIN (Dept)

Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
ADDED: 3:11 PM
SB0106
Chr FIN (Dept)

Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
ADDED: 3:11 PM
SB0110
Chr FIN (Dept)

Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements
ADDED: 3:11 PM
SB0206
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension
ADDED: 3:11 PM
SB0226
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means
ADDED: 3:11 PM
SB0281
Chr FIN (Dept)

Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension
ADDED: 3:11 PM

Change made: January 15, 2021 2:47 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0090
Sen Feldman

Electric Facilities - Study and Procedures
REMOVED: 2:47 PM

Change made: January 15, 2021 3:00 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
January 27, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0280
Sen Feldman

Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Police Complaints Board
REMOVED: 2:47 PM
SB0393
Sen Augustine

Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Coverage and Reimbursement of Telehealth Services
ADDED: 3:00 PM

Change made: January 15, 2021 3:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0005
Sen Griffith, et al

Public Health - Implicit Bias Training and the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities
SB0031
Sen Washington

Electricity and Gas – Energy Suppliers – Supply Offers
SB0041
Sen Augustine

Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
SB0052
Sen Washington

Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
SB0079
Sen Kramer

Electricity – Change of Address – Maintenance of Subscriptions and Contracts
SB0148
Sens West and Feldman

Electric Generation – Transition From Fossil Fuels – Carbon Dioxide Emissions Rate and Transition Plan and Fund (Maryland Coal Community Transition Act of 2021)
SB0389
Sen Gallion, et al

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters - Reimbursement
SB0392
Sen Augustine

Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms
SB0407
Sen Kramer

Electricity – Net Energy Metering – Limit

Change made: January 15, 2021 3:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0359
Sen Rosapepe

Department of Transportation and Department of the Environment – Purple Line Tree Replacement Plan
SB0372
Sen Reilly

Civil Action - Surety Insurance - Failure to Act in Good Faith
SB0387
Sen Cassilly

Intersection of State and Local Highways – Crosswalks and Curb Ramps
SB0399
Sen Carter

Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients - Modifications
SB0411
Sen Kramer

Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rate Increases - Restriction (Equity in Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Act)
SB0412
Sen Hester (Joint Cybersecurity, Informat

Consumer Protection - Right to Repair

Change made: January 15, 2021 3:00 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0064
Sen Salling

Unemployment Insurance - Earned Rating Record - Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID-19
SB0080
Sen Kagan

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
SB0185
Sens Kagan and Reilly

Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
SB0214
Sen Salling

Unemployment Insurance – Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution – Applicable Table of Rates
SB0238
Sen Kramer

Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act)
SB0252
Sen Ellis

Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority - Minority Business Enterprise Procurement Contract Financing Program
SB0286
Sen Augustine

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Services – Modifications
SB0398
Sen Carter

Mental Health Law - Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Procedures

House
Revenues Subcommittee
Change made: January 15, 2021 12:25 PM - HEARING ADDED
Revenues Subcommittee - Voting Session
January 22, 2021 12:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0006
Del Feldmark

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
HB0358
Del Wilson

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund

Other
Baltimore City
Change made: January 15, 2021 10:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Other
January 22, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Local Bill Hearings

Carroll
Change made: January 15, 2021 3:01 PM - HEARING ADDED
Carroll - Other
January 21, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Bills and Priorities.
Initial Meeting of the Carroll County Delegation for the 2021 Session.
General Business.

Frederick
Change made: January 15, 2021 3:24 PM - HEARING ADDED
Frederick - Other
January 22, 2021 9:30 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Economic security update for Frederick County.

Harford
Change made: January 15, 2021 10:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Harford - Other
January 21, 2021 9:00 AM to January 21, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Harford County Delegation Meeting

Montgomery
Change made: January 15, 2021 3:20 PM - HEARING ADDED
Montgomery - Other
January 25, 2021 7:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of Legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: January 15, 2021 10:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
January 25, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders

Change made: January 15, 2021 11:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
January 29, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders