Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 9/23/2020 3:36:58 PM
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
Other
Aging, Maryland Commission on
Change made: September 23, 2020 11:11 AM - HEARING ADDED
Aging, Maryland Commission on - Other
November 18, 2020 10:00 AM to November 18, 2020 12:00 PM
Google Meet Video Conference
To join by phone: +1 585 969 5071
Regularly Scheduled Meeting
PIN: 309 089 740#

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Change made: September 23, 2020 7:37 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
October 8, 2020 9:00 AM to October 8, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).

Change made: September 23, 2020 7:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
October 29, 2020 9:00 AM to October 29, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
On-Line Council Meeting

Change made: September 23, 2020 7:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
November 19, 2020 9:00 AM to November 19, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
On-Line Council Meeting
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.

Change made: September 23, 2020 7:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
December 10, 2020 9:00 AM to December 10, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.