Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 2/26/2021 2:22:19 PM
Friday, February 26, 2021
Friday, February 26, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: February 26, 2021 9:57 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
February 26, 2021 10:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0787
Sen Ferguson

Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax – Exemption and Restriction
ADDED: 9:57 AM

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: February 26, 2021 8:33 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
February 26, 2021 9:45 AM
(Previous Date/Time: February 26, 2021 9:30 AM)
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0010
Sens Waldstreicher and Ferguson

Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
SB0066
Sen Elfreth, et al

Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Digital Inclusion - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
SB0077
Sen Griffith

Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
SB0093
Sen Griffith

Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
SB0283
Sen Elfreth

Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
SB0324
Sens Elfreth and Bailey

Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
SB0418
Sen Pinsky, et al

Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations
SB0427
Sens Elfreth and West

Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
SB0442
Sen Klausmeier

Aquaculture Leases and Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands
SB0448
Sen Edwards

County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles
SB0476
Sen Eckardt

Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Tasks
SB0509
Sen Peters

National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
SB0564
Sen Griffith

Consolidation of the Procurement Improvement Council and the Council for the Procurement of Health, Educational, and Social Services
SB0596
Sen Washington

Election Law - Early Voting Centers - Hours of Operation
SB0697
Sen Eckardt

State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Participation by Gender or Race
SB0703
Sen West

Procurement – Minority Business Enterprises – Qualification and Certification

Change made: February 26, 2021 8:53 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
March 3, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0655
Sen Klausmeier (Balt Co Admin)

Baltimore County - Board of Education - Oversight by the Baltimore County Office of the Inspector General
REMOVED: 8:53 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: February 26, 2021 12:52 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 3, 2021 4:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: February 26, 2021 12:40 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 3, 2021 12:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 3, 2021 12:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: Virtual Meeting)
SB0657
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)

Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
SB0752
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City - Police Officers - Promotional Appointments
SB0852
Sen Hough, et al

Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
SB0853
Sen Carter (Jvnile Justice Refrm Council)

Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
SB0862
Sen Waldstreicher

Arrest Warrants Issued by District Court Commissioners - Recall by Judge
SB0874
Sen Jackson

Workgroup to Study Partial Expungement
SB0875
Sen Jackson

Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
SB0905
Sen Sydnor

Juvenile Services - Workgroup to Develop Evidence-Based, Research-Based, and Culturally Competent Practices

Change made: February 26, 2021 12:41 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2021 12:30 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 4, 2021 11:00 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
(Previous Location: East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD)
SB0115
Sen Patterson

Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
SB0726
Sen Feldman, et al

Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
SB0750
Charles County Senators

Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization
SB0863
Sen Waldstreicher

Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
SB0866
Sen Corderman

Correctional Services – Payment by State – Inmate Housing Costs
SB0868
Sen Corderman, et al

Correctional Services - Inmate Release
SB0879
Sen Guzzone

Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
SB0888
Sen Beidle

Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Maryland Route 175 (Jessup Road)

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: February 26, 2021 11:16 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB1268
Del Henson

Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
ADDED: 11:16 AM

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: February 26, 2021 10:42 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
March 2, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0765
Del Terrasa

Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
REMOVED: 10:42 AM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 26, 2021 1:45 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
March 1, 2021 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0236
Del Hill, et al

Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021)
HB0611
Del Hill

Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
HB0667
Del Sample-Hughes

General Provisions - State Song - Repeal
HB0673
Del Valentino-Smith

State Health Care Facilities - Employees - Alternative Workweeks
HB0811
Del Cullison

State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
HB0873
Del Charles

State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals – Certification – Revisions

Racing and Gaming Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2021 12:56 PM - HEARING ADDED
Racing and Gaming Subcommittee - Work Session
March 1, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Sports Wagering Workgroup
Change made: February 26, 2021 12:22 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Sports Wagering Workgroup - Other
March 1, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Workgroup regarding HB940

Other
Frederick
Change made: February 26, 2021 6:30 AM - HEARING ADDED
Frederick - Other
March 1, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Frederick County Delegation Meeting

Montgomery
Change made: February 26, 2021 12:14 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Montgomery - Other
March 1, 2021 7:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Metro Washington Area Committee.

Click to return on the top page