Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/26/2020 4:46:17 PM
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
Senate
Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2020 9:02 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 27, 2020 8:30 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital Department of Disabilities
Capital Board of Public Works
Capital Judiciary
Capital Department of Health
Capital Maryland State Library Agency
Capital Baltimore City Community College
Capital Morgan State University
Capital Department of Housing and Community Development
Capital Maryland Department of the Environment
Capital Maryland Independent College and University Association
Capital Local Jails and Detention Centers

Change made: February 26, 2020 9:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 27, 2020 9:00 AM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital Maryland State Library Agency
Capital Department of Housing and Community Development
Capital Maryland Department of the Environment

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: February 26, 2020 9:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2020 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB1046
Sen McCray

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 Licenses
ADDED: 9:35 AM

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: February 26, 2020 4:18 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 27, 2020 12:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0815
Sen Waldstreicher

Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020)
REMOVED: 4:18 PM

Change made: February 26, 2020 4:18 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 11, 2020 12:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0815
Sen Waldstreicher

Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020)
ADDED: 4:18 PM

Change made: February 26, 2020 12:59 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 12, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB1006
Sen Carter, et al

Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
ADDED: 12:59 PM
SB1034
Sen Patterson, et al

Criminal Law - Felony Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
ADDED: 12:59 PM

House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: February 26, 2020 10:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 27, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0849
Del Rogers, et al

Insurance - Rate Effectiveness and People's Insurance Counsel Division
REMOVED: 10:08 AM

Change made: February 26, 2020 12:33 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
March 3, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB1371
Del Brooks

Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders
REMOVED: 12:33 PM

Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 26, 2020 10:05 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 26, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1296
Del Adams

Hunting - Regulated Shooting Areas - Offshore Stationary Blinds and Blind Sites
REMOVED: 10:05 AM

Change made: February 26, 2020 1:08 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB1059
Del Clark, et al

Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations
REMOVED: 1:08 PM

Change made: February 26, 2020 3:07 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 3, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0360
The Spkr (Admin), et al

Ethics and Accountability in Government Act
ADDED: 3:07 PM

Change made: February 26, 2020 11:40 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
March 10, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0925
Del Buckel, et al

Department of Natural Resources - Acquisition of Land, Water, or Easements in Garrett and Allegany Counties - Subdivision of Property
ADDED: 11:40 AM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 26, 2020 9:52 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 26, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0639
Del P. Young, et al

Public Health - Health Care Professionals - Cultural Competency Coursework or Training
REMOVED: 9:52 AM

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: February 26, 2020 1:46 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
February 27, 2020 11:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0530
Del Kelly, et al

Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
REMOVED: 1:46 PM

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 26, 2020 9:54 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 26, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0399
Del Lisanti

Civil Actions – Duty to Render Assistance (First Responder Safety Act)
REMOVED: 9:54 AM

Change made: February 26, 2020 1:40 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB1459
Del Malone

Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
REMOVED: 1:40 PM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 26, 2020 10:45 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 26, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB1347
Dels Washington and Ivey

Public Schools - Applicants for Employment - Race and Gender Information
REMOVED: 10:45 AM

Other
Aging, Maryland Commission on
Change made: February 26, 2020 9:57 AM - HEARING ADDED
Aging, Maryland Commission on - Other
April 8, 2020 10:00 AM to April 8, 2020 12:00 PM
Patuxent Arts Room, North Laurel Community Center, 9411 Whiskey Bottom Road, Laurel, MD
Regularly Scheduled Meeting

Baltimore City
Change made: February 26, 2020 8:22 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Briefing
February 28, 2020 8:30 AM
House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Special Presentation: Port of Baltimore

Change made: February 26, 2020 8:24 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2020 9:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
HB0879
Del Mosby, et al

Baltimore City - Civil Actions - Liability of Toxic Substance Manufacturers
HB1189
Del Smith

Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
HB1408
Del Attar

Public Safety - Baltimore City - P.R.O.T.E.C.T. (Public Resources Organizing to End Crime Together) Program
HB1472
Del Conaway

Baltimore City - Solar Panels on Commercial and Residential Structures - Prohibition on Limitation

Change made: February 26, 2020 8:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Voting Session
February 28, 2020 9:30 AM
House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
HB1160
Del Boyce

Baltimore City - Imitation Firearms - Prohibition
HB1286
Del Wells

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensed Premises - Extended Hours
HB1293
Del Wells, et al

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 Licenses - Surveillance System

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Change made: February 26, 2020 11:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
March 2, 2020 1:30 PM to March 2, 2020 3:30 PM
Prince Georges County Government Office, 1801 McCormick Drive, Conference Room 140, Largo, MD
Prince George's County Regional Listening Sessions

Change made: February 26, 2020 11:07 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
March 2, 2020 6:30 PM to March 2, 2020 8:30 PM
Prince Georges County Government Office, 1801 McCormick Drive, Conference Room 140, Largo, MD
Prince George's County Regional Listening Sessions.

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: February 26, 2020 3:55 PM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
February 27, 2020 11:00 AM to February 27, 2020 12:30 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Meeting of the Baltimore City Senate Delegation