Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 7/29/2021 8:01:55 PM
Thursday, July 29, 2021
Thursday, July 29, 2021
Other
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Change made: July 29, 2021 4:04 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee - Other
August 11, 2021 1:00 PM
Conference Room A&B, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
Initial meeting of the Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee (joint with CHRC Commissioners).

Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee
Change made: July 29, 2021 4:26 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
August 25, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Office of Legislative Audits: Summary Reports Issued and Recommended Committee Action
Audit: Department of Human Services-Social Services Administration (June 2021)
Audit: Judiciary (April 2021)

Change made: July 29, 2021 4:27 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
November 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: July 29, 2021 4:28 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee - Other
December 1, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: July 29, 2021 3:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
August 11, 2021 10:30 AM
Conference Room A&B, 100 Community Place, Crownsville, MD
Regular meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission

Click to return on the top page