Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 12/3/2020 6:51:37 PM
Thursday, December 3, 2020
Thursday, December 3, 2020
House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Change made: December 3, 2020 4:07 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
December 17, 2020 3:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing on MEDCO operated student housing at University of Maryland- College Park and Towson University.

Health and Social Services Subcommittee
Change made: December 3, 2020 5:53 PM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
December 10, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing on MDH procurement policies and COVID-19 vaccine distribution.

Oversight Committee on Personnel
Change made: December 3, 2020 5:43 PM - HEARING ADDED
Oversight Committee on Personnel - Briefing
December 16, 2020 2:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing on the health and safety of State employees during the COVID-19 pandemic.
ADDED: 5:43 PM

Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
Change made: December 3, 2020 1:08 PM - HEARING ADDED
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
December 11, 2020 11:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Briefing on Transit Reform in Maryland: New Models for Accountability, Stability, and Equity

Other
Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on
Change made: December 3, 2020 4:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Future of Western Maryland, Task Force on - Other
December 14, 2020 10:00 AM to December 14, 2020 11:30 AM
Google Meet Video Conference
Discussion of Preliminary Recommendations.

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Change made: December 3, 2020 2:57 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
December 10, 2020 9:00 AM to December 10, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
REMOVED: 2:57 PM