Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/19/2020 11:32:31 AM
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
Senate
Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:10 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
February 24, 2020 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:11 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
February 24, 2020 5:00 PM
Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

House
Environment and Transportation Committee
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:53 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 25, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
HB0903
Del Rosenberg

Landlord and Tenant – Surrender of Premises – Required Information to a Tenant or Other Occupant
REMOVED: 10:53 AM

Environment Subcommittee
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:20 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Environment Subcommittee - Other
February 19, 2020 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:30 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Environment Subcommittee - Other
February 26, 2020 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:33 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Environment Subcommittee - Other
March 4, 2020 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 19, 2020 7:49 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 28, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0997
Del Brooks, et al

Task Force to Study Veterans' Suicide Causes and Prevention
REMOVED: 7:49 AM

Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:21 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Other
February 19, 2020 3:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:30 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Other
February 26, 2020 3:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:33 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee - Other
March 4, 2020 3:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Judiciary Committee
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:40 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
February 20, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
HB0887
Del R. Lewis

Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information
REMOVED: 10:40 AM

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:30 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Other
February 25, 2020 3:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:32 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Other
March 3, 2020 3:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:29 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Other
February 20, 2020 3:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:31 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Other
February 27, 2020 3:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:34 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Other
March 5, 2020 3:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:28 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Other
February 20, 2020 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:31 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Other
February 27, 2020 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:34 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Other
March 5, 2020 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:29 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Other
February 25, 2020 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:32 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Other
March 3, 2020 3:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Other
Baltimore City
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Other
February 21, 2020 8:30 AM
House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Special Guest: Baltimore City State's Attorney, Marilyn Mosby

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:36 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2020 9:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
HB0768
Del Attar

Baltimore City - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Registration and License Information
HB0954
Del Smith, et al

Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Exchange of Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
HB1160
Del Boyce

Baltimore City - Imitation Firearms - Prohibition
HB1189
Del Smith

Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
HB1286
Del Wells

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licensed Premises - Extended Hours

Change made: February 19, 2020 10:37 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Voting Session
February 21, 2020 10:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
HB0207
Del Wells, et al

Baltimore City Community College - Procurement Authority
HB1293
Del Wells, et al

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 Licenses - Surveillance System

Baltimore County
Change made: February 19, 2020 9:36 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Briefing
February 21, 2020 9:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 180
Motorola Solutions
Baltimore County Fire Chief
Baltimore County Police Chief

Change made: February 19, 2020 9:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Bill Hearing
February 21, 2020 9:30 AM
House Office Building, Room 180
HB0203
Del Hettleman, et al

Community Parks and Playgrounds Program - Baltimore County and Howard County - Expansion
HB0611
Del P. Young, et al

Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
HB0755
Del Long

Baltimore County - Board of Education - Retention Policy for Financial Records
HB0990
Del Grammer

Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
HB1228
Del Boteler, et al

Baltimore County Board of Education - Nonstudent Member Compensation and Student Member Scholarships
HB1373
Del Boteler, et al

Baltimore County Board of Education - Legal Counsel and Chief Budget Analyst

Change made: February 19, 2020 9:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Voting Session
February 21, 2020 10:00 AM
House Office Building, Room 180
HB0505
Del Metzgar, et al

Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase
HB0595
Del P. Young, et al

Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting
HB0598
Del P. Young, et al

Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Scholarship
HB0599
Del P. Young, et al

Baltimore County Board of Education - Student Member - Selection
HB0600
Del P. Young, et al

Baltimore County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
HB0626
Del Grammer

Baltimore County - Repossession - Disposition of Property
HB0685
Del Johnson, et al

Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers and Deputy Sheriffs
HB1304
Del Brooks, et al

Baltimore County - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
HB1436
Del Brooks

Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals

Baltimore Symphony Orchestra, Workgroup on
Change made: February 19, 2020 10:30 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore Symphony Orchestra, Workgroup on - Other
February 24, 2020 11:30 AM
Meyerhoff Symphony Hall, 1212 Cathedral Street, Baltimore, MD
General Meeting