Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/18/2021 1:58:03 PM
Monday, January 18, 2021
Monday, January 18, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 18, 2021 12:09 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
January 21, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on the Economy
REMOVED: 12:09 PM
Briefing on the Economy - Dan White, Moody's Analytics
ADDED: 12:09 PM

Change made: January 18, 2021 12:14 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0076
Sen Kramer

Climate Crisis and Education Act
SB0362
Sen McCray

Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Revenue and Distribution
SB0366
Sen McCray

Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
SB0370
Sen Peters

Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
SB0376
Sen Kagan

Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
SB0391
Sen Gallion

Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill
SB0413
Sen Guzzone

Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding – Abandoned Property

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 18, 2021 8:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0360
Sen Rosapepe

State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
SB0363
Sen McCray

Courts – Improperly Summoning a Police Officer – Civil Liability
SB0364
Sen McCray

Baltimore City – Civil Claims Against Law Enforcement Officers of an Institution of Higher Education – Prohibition Against Nondisclosure Provision in Settlement Agreement
SB0369
Sen Peters

Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
SB0394
Sen Carter

Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
SB0401
Sen Carter

Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
SB0402
Sen Carter

Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal

Change made: January 18, 2021 8:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2021 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0368
Sen Peters

Speed Monitoring Systems – Municipal Corporations – Authorization
SB0373
Sen Reilly

Vehicle Laws – Suspension of Driver’s License or Vehicle Registration – Unpaid Judgments
SB0377
Sen Kagan

Vehicle Laws – Rental Vehicles – Provision of Spare Tires
SB0388
Sen Cassilly

Vehicle Registration – Disability Plates – Parking Meter Fees
SB0397
Sen Carter

Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
SB0408
Sens Kramer and Zucker

Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties

Change made: January 18, 2021 8:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0383
Sen Cassilly

Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures
SB0385
Sen Cassilly

Organized Retail Theft
SB0395
Sen Carter

Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
SB0400
Sen Carter

Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
SB0406
Sen Augustine

Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees

House
Education Subcommittee
Change made: January 18, 2021 9:41 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Education Subcommittee - Other
January 22, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 18, 2021 12:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
January 22, 2021 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0171
Del Washington

State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
HB0237
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
HB0320
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
HB0373
Del Wilson

Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
HB0394
Del Smith

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 18, 2021 9:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 19, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0177
Del Ivey

Property Tax – Real Property Tax Rate – Prohibition on Increase During Public Health Emergency
REMOVED: 9:35 AM

Change made: January 18, 2021 9:16 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0423
Del Feldmark

Election Law - Voting Systems - Accessibility for Voters With Disabilities
HB0424
Del Feldmark

Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
HB0433
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21
HB0450
Del Henson

Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
HB0459
Del Mangione

Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
HB0481
Del Barve

Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
HB0493
Del Guyton

Election Law - Voting Locations - Accessibility by Public Transportation and Voters With Disabilities
HB0497
Del Boyce

Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Repeal of Repayment Requirement
HB0536
Del Acevero

Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions