Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 9/23/2020 4:56:00 PM
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: September 23, 2020 4:11 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Other
October 8, 2020 1:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
Public Hearing on the Maryland School for the Deaf

Other
Aging, Maryland Commission on
Change made: September 23, 2020 11:11 AM - HEARING ADDED
Aging, Maryland Commission on - Other
November 18, 2020 10:00 AM to November 18, 2020 12:00 PM
Google Meet Video Conference
To join by phone: +1 585 969 5071
Regularly Scheduled Meeting
PIN: 309 089 740#

Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR)
Change made: September 23, 2020 4:52 PM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) - Other
October 2, 2020 1:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
A link will be made available to the public prior to the start of the meeting.
Briefing by the State Board of Elections on emergency regulations.

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Change made: September 23, 2020 7:37 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
October 8, 2020 9:00 AM to October 8, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).

Change made: September 23, 2020 7:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
October 29, 2020 9:00 AM to October 29, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.
On-Line Council Meeting

Change made: September 23, 2020 7:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
November 19, 2020 9:00 AM to November 19, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
On-Line Council Meeting
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.

Change made: September 23, 2020 7:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Juvenile Justice Reform Council - Other
December 10, 2020 9:00 AM to December 10, 2020 11:00 AM
Zoom Meeting
On-Line Council Meeting
The meeting will be open to the public for viewing only (no participation).
A link will be provided to the public in advance of the meeting.