Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 8/13/2020 8:03:52 PM
Thursday, August 13, 2020
Thursday, August 13, 2020
House
Ways and Means Committee
Change made: August 13, 2020 11:25 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
September 2, 2020 1:30 PM
Virtual Meeting

Other
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Change made: August 13, 2020 10:43 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission - Briefing
September 14, 2020 2:00 PM to September 14, 2020 3:00 PM
On-Line Meeting
Update on the Maryland Reinsurance Program.
Briefing on the funding of reinsurance programs in other states.

Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Change made: August 13, 2020 10:38 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board - Other
September 9, 2020 11:30 AM to September 9, 2020 1:30 PM
Conference Call
Virtual meeting to discuss issues pertaining to the Maryland life sciences community.

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Change made: August 13, 2020 2:04 PM - HEARING UPDATED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
August 20, 2020 9:00 AM to August 20, 2020 12:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: August 13, 2020 9:00 AM to 1:00 PM)
On-Line Meeting
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.

Change made: August 13, 2020 2:12 PM - HEARING ADDED
School Construction, Interagency Commission on - Other
September 10, 2020 9:00 AM to September 10, 2020 12:00 PM
On-Line Meeting
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.