Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/15/2021 11:25:32 AM
Friday, January 15, 2021
Friday, January 15, 2021
Other
Baltimore City
Change made: January 15, 2021 10:56 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore City - Other
January 22, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Local Bill Hearings

Harford
Change made: January 15, 2021 10:54 AM - HEARING ADDED
Harford - Other
January 21, 2021 9:00 AM to January 21, 2021 10:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Harford County Delegation Meeting

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: January 15, 2021 10:58 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
January 25, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders

Change made: January 15, 2021 11:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
January 29, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation with Baltimore City Stakeholders