Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/1/2021 12:33:57 PM
Monday, March 1, 2021
Monday, March 1, 2021
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: March 1, 2021 7:32 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0806
Sen Peters

Labor and Employment – Workplace Fraud Act – Rebuttable Presumption of the Employer–Employee Relationship
REMOVED: 7:32 AM

House
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2021 11:59 AM - HEARING ADDED
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 3, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HB 5 and HB 317

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: March 1, 2021 9:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 16, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0024
Del Ivey

State Holidays - Primary Election Day
HB0157
Del W. Fisher

Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
HB0199
Del Wilson

Maryland State Sport - Lacrosse
HB0300
Dorchester County Delegation

Commemorative Days - Maryland Voting Equity Reform Day
HB0448
Del Harrison

State Government - Legal and Employee Holiday - Juneteenth National Freedom Day
HB0586
Del R. Watson

General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
HB0676
Del Bhandari

General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
HB0762
Del Kittleman

State Designations - State Astronomical Feature - Crab Nebula

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2021 11:59 AM - HEARING ADDED
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
March 4, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HB 182, 276, 288, 540, 674, 736, 806, 983

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 1, 2021 12:08 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
March 2, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0688
Del McComas

Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
REMOVED: 12:08 PM

MD Essential Worker Protection Act Workgroup
Change made: March 1, 2021 12:19 PM - HEARING ADDED
MD Essential Worker Protection Act Workgroup - Other
March 5, 2021 8:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
HB581 - Labor and Employment - Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers Protection Act)

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Change made: March 1, 2021 9:23 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 2, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
- HB 598, 643, 689, 812

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: March 1, 2021 9:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
March 23, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0006
Sens Lam and Hough

General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
SB0296
Sen Simonaire

Election Law – Campaign Finance – Protection of Contributor Information
SB0310
Chr EHE (Dept)

Election Law – Campaign Finance Entities – Termination
SB0325
Chr B&T (Dept)

Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
SB0366
Sen McCray

Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force

Other
No. 11 - Baltimore City
Change made: March 1, 2021 8:42 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 8, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Change made: March 1, 2021 8:44 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 11 - Baltimore City - Other
March 12, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

Click to return on the top page