Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/18/2021 2:40:01 PM
Monday, January 18, 2021
Monday, January 18, 2021
Senate
Budget and Taxation Committee
Change made: January 18, 2021 2:31 PM - HEARING CANCELED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 20, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0001
Sen Sydnor, et al

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
SB0045
Sen Patterson

State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
SB0081
Sen Ellis

Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding
SB0102
Sen Eckardt

Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
SB0113
Sen Rosapepe

Opportunity Zone Tax Deduction Reform Act of 2021
SB0133
Sen Rosapepe

Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2021
SB0171
Sen Guzzone

Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
SB0199
Sens McCray and Zucker

Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
SB0218
Sen King

Maryland Child Tax Credit
SB0241
Sen Peters

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
SB0269
Sen Ellis

Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Refund

Change made: January 18, 2021 2:39 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
January 21, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0001
Sen Sydnor, et al

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
ADDED: 2:39 PM

Change made: January 18, 2021 12:09 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
January 21, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on the Economy
REMOVED: 12:09 PM
Briefing on the Economy - Dan White, Moody's Analytics
ADDED: 12:09 PM

Change made: January 18, 2021 12:14 PM - HEARING ADDED
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0076
Sen Kramer

Climate Crisis and Education Act
SB0362
Sen McCray

Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Revenue and Distribution
SB0366
Sen McCray

Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
SB0370
Sen Peters

Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
SB0376
Sen Kagan

Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
SB0391
Sen Gallion

Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill
SB0413
Sen Guzzone

Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding – Abandoned Property

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 18, 2021 2:39 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
January 28, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0381
Sen Cassilly

Law Enforcement Officers’ Bill of Rights – Uniform Disciplinary Procedures
ADDED: 2:39 PM

Change made: January 18, 2021 8:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0360
Sen Rosapepe

State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
SB0363
Sen McCray

Courts – Improperly Summoning a Police Officer – Civil Liability
SB0364
Sen McCray

Baltimore City – Civil Claims Against Law Enforcement Officers of an Institution of Higher Education – Prohibition Against Nondisclosure Provision in Settlement Agreement
SB0369
Sen Peters

Child Abuse and Neglect - Memorandum of Understanding With Military Family Advocacy Program
SB0394
Sen Carter

Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
SB0401
Sen Carter

Landlord-Tenant - Nonrenewal of Lease - Notice Requirements
SB0402
Sen Carter

Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Repeal

Change made: January 18, 2021 8:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2021 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0368
Sen Peters

Speed Monitoring Systems – Municipal Corporations – Authorization
SB0373
Sen Reilly

Vehicle Laws – Suspension of Driver’s License or Vehicle Registration – Unpaid Judgments
SB0377
Sen Kagan

Vehicle Laws – Rental Vehicles – Provision of Spare Tires
SB0388
Sen Cassilly

Vehicle Registration – Disability Plates – Parking Meter Fees
SB0397
Sen Carter

Correctional Services - Diminution Credits - Education
SB0408
Sens Kramer and Zucker

Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties

Change made: January 18, 2021 8:41 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0383
Sen Cassilly

Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures
SB0385
Sen Cassilly

Organized Retail Theft
SB0395
Sen Carter

Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
SB0400
Sen Carter

Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
SB0406
Sen Augustine

Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees

House
Education Subcommittee
Change made: January 18, 2021 9:41 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Education Subcommittee - Other
January 22, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Change made: January 18, 2021 12:31 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education Subcommittee - Voting Session
January 22, 2021 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0171
Del Washington

State Department of Education - School Discipline - Data Collection
HB0237
Del Ebersole

State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
HB0320
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
HB0373
Del Wilson

Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
HB0394
Del Smith

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 18, 2021 9:35 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 19, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0177
Del Ivey

Property Tax – Real Property Tax Rate – Prohibition on Increase During Public Health Emergency
REMOVED: 9:35 AM

Change made: January 18, 2021 2:13 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
January 28, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0443
Del McKay

Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
ADDED: 2:13 PM
HB0474
Del Guyton

Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards - Sunset Extension
ADDED: 2:13 PM
HB0482
Del Kaiser

Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund Advisory Committee - Membership
ADDED: 2:13 PM
HB0511
Del Valentino-Smith

Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
ADDED: 2:13 PM
HB0532
Allegany County Delegation

Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
ADDED: 2:13 PM

Change made: January 18, 2021 9:16 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0423
Del Feldmark

Election Law - Voting Systems - Accessibility for Voters With Disabilities
HB0424
Del Feldmark

Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
HB0433
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21
HB0450
Del Henson

Election Law – Polling Sites – Firearms Prohibitions
HB0459
Del Mangione

Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
HB0481
Del Barve

Election Law - Deadline for Selection of Lieutenant Governor
HB0493
Del Guyton

Election Law - Voting Locations - Accessibility by Public Transportation and Voters With Disabilities
HB0497
Del Boyce

Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - Repeal of Repayment Requirement
HB0536
Del Acevero

Public Financing Act - State Senate and House of Delegates Candidates and Matching Fund Revisions

Change made: January 18, 2021 2:13 PM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 4, 2021 1:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0113
Dels Lierman and Korman

Board of Revenue Estimates and Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Organization and Operations
HB0435
Del Smith

State Individual Income Tax – Millionaires’ Tax
HB0495
Del Palakovich Carr

Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments and the Federal CARES Act - Decoupling
HB0539
Del Buckel

Historic Revitalization Tax Credit - Certified Historic Structure and Single-Family, Owner-Occupied Residence - Definitions