Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 2/20/2020 4:40:40 PM
Thursday, February 20, 2020
Thursday, February 20, 2020
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: February 20, 2020 11:36 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
February 26, 2020 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0983
Sens Hester and Serafini

Education - Maryland Data Analysis and Accountability Program - Established
ADDED: 11:36 AM

Change made: February 20, 2020 11:36 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
March 3, 2020 1:00 PM
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
SB0983
Sens Hester and Serafini

Education - Maryland Data Analysis and Accountability Program - Established
REMOVED: 11:36 AM

Finance Committee
Change made: February 20, 2020 12:07 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 25, 2020 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB0529
Sen Feldman

Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
REMOVED: 12:07 PM

House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: February 20, 2020 10:37 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 20, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0886
Del Howard, et al

Electric Companies - Billing Information
REMOVED: 10:37 AM

Change made: February 20, 2020 3:25 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 27, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0861
Del Hornberger, et al

Public Utilities - Underground Facilities - Time-Sensitive Ticket
REMOVED: 3:25 PM

Change made: February 20, 2020 4:10 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
March 2, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
HB0281
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Licenses Prohibition - Exceptions PG 305-20
ADDED: 4:10 PM
HB0288
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcohol Awareness PG 301-20
ADDED: 4:10 PM
HB0291
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses for Supermarkets PG 308-20
ADDED: 4:10 PM
HB0293
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Shopping Center License PG 303-20
ADDED: 4:10 PM
HB0294
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Family Entertainment Permit PG 304-20
ADDED: 4:10 PM
HB1047
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 314-20
ADDED: 4:10 PM
HB1283
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Lounge License PG 312-20
ADDED: 4:10 PM

Health and Government Operations Committee
Change made: February 20, 2020 11:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 4, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HB0113
Del Grammer

Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights - Minor Patients
ADDED: 11:08 AM
HB1417
Del Krimm

Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund
ADDED: 11:08 AM

Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee
Change made: February 20, 2020 9:30 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Other
February 20, 2020 5:30 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: February 20, 2020 9:30 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Other
February 20, 2020 5:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee Meeting

Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: February 20, 2020 12:42 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee - Bill Hearing
March 2, 2020 2:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
SB0748
The Pres (DLS)

Annual Curative Bill
ADDED: 12:42 PM
SB0749
The Pres (DLS)

Annual Corrective Bill
ADDED: 12:42 PM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: February 20, 2020 11:44 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 25, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0798
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Property Tax - Credit for Senior Citizen Volunteers MC 23-20
REMOVED: 11:44 AM

Change made: February 20, 2020 11:45 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 27, 2020 1:00 PM
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
HB0874
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Annual Land Preservation Fee MC 16-20
REMOVED: 11:45 AM