Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 3/4/2021 11:46:33 AM
Thursday, March 4, 2021
Thursday, March 4, 2021
Senate
Executive Nominations Committee
Change made: March 4, 2021 8:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Appear
March 8, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Change made: March 4, 2021 8:34 AM - HEARING ADDED
Executive Nominations Committee - Not Appear
March 8, 2021 5:00 PM
Virtual Meeting
** For the full list of nominees, go to the current hearing schedule

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 16, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0395
Sen Carter

Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children

Change made: March 4, 2021 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 17, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0009
Del Shetty

Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
HB0019
Del Holmes

Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
HB0243
Del Atterbeary

Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
HB0297
Del Pena-Melnyk

Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension
HB0322
Dels Hill and Feldmark

Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping
HB0352
Del Holmes

Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
HB0367
Del Holmes

Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
HB0399
Del Krimm

Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
HB0451
Del Henson

Real Property – Residential Rental Property Inspection – Remote Visual Inspection

Change made: March 4, 2021 10:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
March 18, 2021 12:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0250
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
HB0268
Del Grammer

Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
HB0347
Del Shetty

Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
HB0356
Del Qi

Corporations and Associations – Filing Fee Study
HB0483
Del Turner

Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Reclamation Hours

House
Economic Matters Committee
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:08 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
March 5, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0986
Del Harrison

Labor and Employment - Workplace Fraud Act - Rebuttable Presumption of the Employer-Employee Relationship
REMOVED: 10:08 AM

Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Work Session
March 8, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
-HB 565

Judiciary Committee
Change made: March 4, 2021 8:40 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
March 4, 2021 5:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0670
The Spkr (Plc Rfm Accntblty Wrkgrp)

Police Reform and Accountability Act of 2021

Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Work Session
March 8, 2021 3:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Public Utilities Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:04 AM - HEARING ADDED
Public Utilities Subcommittee - Work Session
March 11, 2021 3:00 PM to March 11, 2021 4:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Racing and Gaming Subcommittee
Change made: March 4, 2021 11:03 AM - HEARING ADDED
Racing and Gaming Subcommittee - Work Session
March 4, 2021 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Change made: March 4, 2021 8:50 AM - HEARING ADDED
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On - Other
May 11, 2021 5:30 PM
Virtual Meeting
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

No. 7 - Prince George's County
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:00 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 7 - Prince George's County - Other
March 4, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearing
ADDED: 10:00 AM

Prince George's
Change made: March 4, 2021 10:00 AM - HEARING CANCELED
Prince George's - Other
March 4, 2021 6:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearing

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Change made: March 4, 2021 7:02 AM - HEARING ADDED
Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup - Other
March 8, 2021 4:00 PM to March 8, 2021 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page