Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke

District
31B
County
Anne Arundel
Committee Assignment(s)
Health and Government Operations Committee
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Annapolis Info
212 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3421 | 301-858-3421
Toll-free in MD 1-800-492-7122 ext. 3421
Fax 410-841-3553 | 301-858-3553
Interim Info
212 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401
Phone 410-841-3421 | 301-858-3421
Fax 410-841-3553 | 301-858-3553
Contact
nicholaus.kipke@house.state.md.us
Party
Republican
Tenure
First elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 2006. Member of the House January 10, 2007 to January 14 2015, representing District 31, Anne Arundel County. Representing District 31B, Anne Arundel County, beginning January 14, 2015.
Current Assignments
2013- Minority Leader
2013 Legislative Policy Committee
2014 House Committee on Rules and Executive Nominations
2007- Health and Government Operations Committee
2020 Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2019 Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2013 Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
2013- Spending Affordability Committee
2019 Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
2019 Marijuana Legalization Work Group
2013 Maryland Veterans Caucus
Past House Service
Affordable Care Act (ACA) Workgroup, 2018; Opioid Workgroup, 2018; Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer, 2015; Joint Committee on Base Realignment and Closure, 2011-2012; Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2007-2011; Government Operations Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2011-2014; Health Occupations and Long Term Care Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2019; Estates and Trusts Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2015-2017; Health Facilities and Occupations Subcommittee, 2017; Insurance Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2007-2019; Health Facilities and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee, 2017-2019; Joint Committee on Federal Relations, 2010-2015; Chair, Anne Arundel County House Delegation, 2013.
Public Service
Maryland Health Care Reform Coordinating Council, 2011-2015; Maryland Communities for a Lifetime Commission, 2010-2011; Maryland Council for New Americans, 2009-2010; Workgroup on Clean and Healthy Waterways, Anne Arundel County Delegation, 2009-2010; Statewide Empowerment Zones for Seniors Commission, 2008-2009; Chair, Workgroup on Correctional Facilities Residential Drug Treatment, 2008-2009; Drug and Alcohol Abuse Council, Anne Arundel County, 2005-2007.
Memberships
Autism Awareness Advocate, 2003-2012; Volunteer, Habitat for Humanity, 2005-2008; Vice Chair, Maryland Interfaith Recover Coalition, 2005-2006; Boulevard Park Improvement Association; North County Republican Club; Life Member, National Rifle Association; Public Policy Dispute Resolution Fellow.
Awards
The Casper R. Taylor, Jr. Founder's Award, House of Delegates, 2018; Very Important Professional Successful by 40, The Daily Record, 2017.
Biographical Information
Born, Baltimore, Maryland, January 26, 1979; Chesapeake High School; Anne Arundel Community College; Restaurant Manager, FriendCo Restaurants, 1995-2000; Manufacturer Representative, REPS & Associates, Inc., 2000-Present; Chair, Church Council, Our Lady of the Chesapeake Catholic Church, 2001-02; Married; three children..
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 8:00 AM