Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Kelly, Dumais, Simmons, Sophocleus, Vitale, Eckardt, Clagett, Hogan, Burns, Dwyer, George, Kipke, McConkey, Minnick, Stocksdale, Valentino-Smith, Wood, Afzali, Aumann, Beidle, Costa, Frank, Krebs, W. Miller, Wilson, Elliott, Hough, and Schulz
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Listing cannabimimetic agents on Schedule I for purposes of designating controlled dangerous substances that may not be legally used, possessed, or distributed; and defining cannabimimetic agents.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
9/04/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {432312/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Vitale) Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {633626/1
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) Rejected (60-76)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 9/04/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {432312/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Vitale) Adopted 30
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) {633626/1 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) Rejected (60-76) 31
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 33
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 32
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM