Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas Fitters
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Plumbing to adopt regulations to require under specified circumstances a specified demonstration of professional competency as a condition of renewal of a master plumber or master natural gas fitters license; providing for implementation of the continuing professional competency program on a phased-in basis; and requiring the Board to convene an advisory workgroup prior to proposing regulations.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 11/07/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM