Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers - Locations for Transaction of Business
Sponsored by
Delegate Bromwell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a secondhand precious metal object dealer to transact business for up to 7 consecutive days at an event that takes place at a location other than the fixed business address at which a specified transaction may occur after giving written notice at least 7 days in advance to the primary and the local law enforcement units with jurisdiction over the place where the event will be held; and providing for an exception.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
9/24/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 9/24/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM