Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification within the State Department of Education beginning in the 2017-2018 school year; providing that the purpose of the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification is to recognize local school systems with start times that are consistent with the school start times recommended by the Department and specified organizations; requiring the Department to grant certification to a local school system that qualifies by meeting specified requirements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0224
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/08/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {995161/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464139/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-3)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/08/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {995161/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 4/09/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments {464139/1 Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-3) 65
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM