Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a participating employer to submit supporting payroll data to the State Retirement Agency regarding a member's contributions at the time contributions are paid to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System; and providing, for violations of the Act, a 10% penalty of the member contribution due, 10% a year interest on delinquent member contributions until paid, a $250 penalty for each payroll for which supporting data is not submitted, and 10% a year interest on a certain penalty assessed under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0306
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions
House 1/22/2019 1/22/2019 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {954561/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Maryland Pension Administration System - Member Contributions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:32 AM