Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Checkoff for Wounded Warrior Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Stifler
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing an income tax checkoff system for voluntary contributions for services to injured service members or to Wounded Warrior programs; requiring the Comptroller to collect and account for contributions made through the income tax checkoff system and to credit the proceeds to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund after deducting the amount necessary to administer the checkoff system; authorizing the Department of Veterans Affairs to spend contributed funding on programs to support injured service members; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2013
Legislative Date
1/14/2013
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2013 1/14/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/14/2013 1/14/2013 Hearing 1/23 at 11:00 a.m.
House 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-912, 9-913 )
(   10-804, 2-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM