Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purpose, composition, powers, and duties of the State Board of Master Electricians; changing the name of the State Board of Master Electricians to the Board of Electricians; authorizing the Board to issue an apprentice license and a journeyperson license under certain circumstances; authorizing the Board to adopt a State electrical code; requiring a county to enforce the State electrical code or a certain local electrical code; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019, October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Occupations and Professions - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101 through 6-103, 6-201 through 6-208, 6-301 through 6-306, 6-306.1, 6-307 through 6-505, 6-309, 6-311, 6-312, 6-316, 6-320, 6-321, 6-401, 6-402, 6-407, 6-501 through 6-505, 6-506, 6-601, 6-602, 6-603, 6-603 through 6-609, 6-604, 6-604 through 6-609, 6-605, 6-701, 6-702 )
(   2-106.9, 2-108 )
(   12-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM